NY A08878 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Lewiston Fire Company No. 1.
Title
Expands the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes by the Volunteer and Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association of Lewiston Fire Company No. 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 8878b |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | print number 8878a |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07319 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to local governments