NY A09169 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commission of corrections and community supervision to establish an annual heat mitigation plan; directs the extreme heat action plan work group of the department of environmental conservation to analyze the impact of extreme heat on incarcerated individuals and people working in prisons.
Title
Directs the commission of corrections and community supervision to establish an annual heat mitigation plan; directs the extreme heat action plan work group of the department of environmental conservation to analyze the impact of extreme heat on incarcerated individuals and people working in prisons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.369 |
2024-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7781A |
2024-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9169a |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.434 |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07781 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY