NY A10136 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the chief of police of the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, from mandatory age requirements; authorizes such chief of police to remain in service until such member has attained the age of 65.
Title
Exempts the chief of police of the town of Southampton, county of Suffolk, from mandatory age requirements; authorizes such chief of police to remain in service until such member has attained the age of 65.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1913 |
2024-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9254 |
2024-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | home rule request |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.513 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.513 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S09254 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10136