NY A10271 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - signed chap.367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - signed chap.367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Binghamton to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to five percent.
Title
Authorizes the city of Binghamton to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to five percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Assembly | signed chap.367 |
2024-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1600 |
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9432 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | home rule request |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.372 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.372 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09432 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10271