NY A10552 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau to amortize the cost of payments to employees upon separation of service from the town.
Title
Authorizes the town of Oyster Bay, county of Nassau to amortize the cost of payments to employees upon separation of service from the town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.178 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1505 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7552 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.427 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.427 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07552 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10552