NY S01890 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Syd O. Sotillo Sickle Cell Treatment Act" which designates sickle cell centers for excellence and outpatient treatment centers.
Title
Establishes the "Syd O. Sotillo Sickle Cell Treatment Act" which designates sickle cell centers for excellence and outpatient treatment centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1629 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1890A |
2024-03-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.380 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02661 (Same As) 2024-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means