NY S02140 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A68A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A68A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to issue guidance to school districts for developing programs to attract underrepresented candidates into the teaching profession and to identify funding available to school districts for such purposes.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to issue guidance to school districts for developing programs to attract underrepresented candidates into the teaching profession and to identify funding available to school districts for such purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A68A |
2023-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2140B |
2023-05-30 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-05-30 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
2023-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2140A |
2023-02-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.287 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00068 (Same As) 2023-09-06 - signed chap.350