NY S02726 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the exercise of powers and duties of the board of elections of the city of New York and its executive management.
Title
Relates to the exercise of powers and duties of the board of elections of the city of New York and its executive management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2726A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A11169 (Same As) 2020-12-04 - referred to election law