NY S02778 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates sheriffs, under-sheriffs and deputy sheriffs of the city of New York as police officers.
Title
Designates sheriffs, under-sheriffs and deputy sheriffs of the city of New York as police officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-04-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.757 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05207 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to codes