NY S03474 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3474A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3474A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the income eligibility threshold for the tuition assistance program.
Title
Increases the income eligibility threshold for the tuition assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3474A |
2024-03-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01889 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - print number 1889a