NY S04361 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the commissioner's duty to ensure employers inform employees about non-disclosure or non-disparagement provisions in employment contracts.
Title
Relates to the commissioner's duty to ensure employers inform employees about non-disclosure or non-disparagement provisions in employment contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1053 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2023-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A06756 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to labor