NY S04622 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for automatic enrollment and recertification simplification for Medicaid managed care plans and long term care plans.
Title
Provides for automatic enrollment and recertification simplification for Medicaid managed care plans and long term care plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.383 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4622B |
2023-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4622A |
2023-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05980 (Same As) 2024-04-02 - amended by restoring to previous print 5980a