NY S05237 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the bridge over the Battenkill River on state route three hundred seventy-two between Barber Avenue and Mill Street in the village of Greenwich, county of Washington, as the "Deputy Chief Brian Buell Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates the bridge over the Battenkill River on state route three hundred seventy-two between Barber Avenue and Mill Street in the village of Greenwich, county of Washington, as the "Deputy Chief Brian Buell Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3162 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1491 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03162 (Same As) 2023-09-29 - signed chap.504