NY S05385 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7453A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7453A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the requirement to lock voting machines; requires sealing of removable memory cards or other similar electronic media.
Title
Relates to the requirement to lock voting machines; requires sealing of removable memory cards or other similar electronic media.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7453A |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1031 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07453 (Same As) 2011-07-20 - signed chap.169