NY S06273 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6273A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6273A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides state aid for certain special education services for children with autism spectrum disorder in preschool.
Title
Provides state aid for certain special education services for children with autism spectrum disorder in preschool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6273A |
2018-03-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1916 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08429 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - print number 8429a