NY S06870 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.683
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - SIGNED CHAP.683
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to standards of care for animals held in, or being transported by, animal shelters; establishes an animal shelter regulation fund.
Title
Relates to standards of care for animals held in, or being transported by, animal shelters; establishes an animal shelter regulation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.683 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.299 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a6246c |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1430 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6870B |
2022-03-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6870A |
2022-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A06246 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s6870b