NY S06956 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6956A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6956A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to develop a sustainability plan for the state university of New York downstate medical center; provides that such sustainability plan shall not limit or alter the rights of employees pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to develop a sustainability plan for the state university of New York downstate medical center; provides that such sustainability plan shall not limit or alter the rights of employees pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement.
Sponsors
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6956A |
2024-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1333 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07546 (Same As) 2024-02-29 - print number 7546a