NY S07543 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the Mary Cariola Children's Center, Inc. located in Rochester, New York.
Title
Authorizes the dormitory authority to provide financing to the Mary Cariola Children's Center, Inc. located in Rochester, New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.513 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7543A |
2020-02-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09644 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - print number 9644a