NY S07685 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.811
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.811
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Suffolk regional off-track betting corporations to host up to 2000 video lottery gaming devices; provides that in the Nassau region such facility shall not exceed one thousand video lottery gaming devices.
Title
Authorizes Suffolk regional off-track betting corporations to host up to 2000 video lottery gaming devices; provides that in the Nassau region such facility shall not exceed one thousand video lottery gaming devices.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] |
Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.811 |
2022-12-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.601 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a2210c |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1836 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7685B |
2022-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-02-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7685A |
2022-02-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2022-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A02210 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s7685b