NY S08735 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes protections for minors who are featured in influencer-generated content that generate earnings from being shared on social media or other video-sharing websites.
Title
Establishes protections for minors who are featured in influencer-generated content that generate earnings from being shared on social media or other video-sharing websites.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1772 |
2024-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8735A |
2024-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2024-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A00312 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - print number 312b