NY S08945 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the residency requirement for assistant district attorneys in Schenectady county.
Title
Waives the residency requirement for assistant district attorneys in Schenectady county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9706 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1052 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09706 (Same As) 2024-08-28 - signed chap.249