NY S09107 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reserved funds for special educational services for certain children with disabilities.
Title
Relates to reserved funds for special educational services for certain children with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.515 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a10315a |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2024-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 9107A |
2024-06-03 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-03 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | referred to education |
2024-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1286 |
2024-05-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2024-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10315 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s9107a