NY S09341 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical changes to provisions providing for certification for service as a retired judge of the court of appeals or a retired justice of the supreme court.
Title
Makes technical changes to provisions providing for certification for service as a retired judge of the court of appeals or a retired justice of the supreme court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.196 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.593 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a10470 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1482 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10470 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9341