NY S09462 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1204A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1204A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes treatment of workers' compensation injuries by an occupational therapy assistant and a physical therapy assistant; directs certain records to be retained.
Title
Authorizes treatment of workers' compensation injuries by an occupational therapy assistant and a physical therapy assistant; directs certain records to be retained.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1204A |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1535 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9462A |
2024-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01204 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY