NY S09470 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes special proceedings to convey title to abandoned commercial and industrial property to a city, town, or village; provides for certification of abandonment, notice to the owner of record, commencement of proceedings and the decision and judgment of the court; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Authorizes special proceedings to convey title to abandoned commercial and industrial property to a city, town, or village; provides for certification of abandonment, notice to the owner of record, commencement of proceedings and the decision and judgment of the court; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.113 |
2022-12-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.837 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.526 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a5337a |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1886 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05337 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9470