NY S09741 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.194
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.194
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of East Hampton to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland for the purpose of a Suffolk County roadway improvement project.
Title
Authorizes the town of East Hampton to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland for the purpose of a Suffolk County roadway improvement project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.194 |
2024-07-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | home rule request |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.548 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a10413a |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-05 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2024-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1802 |
2024-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9741A |
2024-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10413 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9741a