OH HB116 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-12)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-12)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3313.666, 3313.667, 3319.073, and 3333.31 of the Revised Code to enact the "Jessica Logan Act" regarding public schools' policies prohibiting harassment, intimidation, or bullying and to qualify certain homeschooled students for in-state tuition at state institutions of higher education.
Title
To enact the "Jessica Logan Act" regarding public schools' policies prohibiting harassment, intimidation, or bullying and to qualify certain homeschooled students for in-state tuition at state institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-25 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | Effective Date | |
2012-02-02 | Governor' Action | |
2012-02-11 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-01-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-01-26 | Concurrence | |
2012-01-18 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-01-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-06-22 | To Education | |
2011-06-22 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-06-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-06-09 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-02-22 | To Education | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 666 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 667 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 19 | 073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 33 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |