OH HB116 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-13)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-30 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-30 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.42, 109.572, 109.88, 901.511, 2137.14, 2909.07, 2913.01, 2913.04, 2913.05, 2913.49, 2919.25, 2919.251, 2919.26, 2921.22, 2923.04, 2923.129, 2927.12, 2933.51, 3712.09, 3721.121, 3750.09, 3751.04, and 5503.101 and to enact sections 2913.86, 2913.87, 2913.88, 2913.89, 2913.90, 2913.91, 2913.92, 2913.93, and 2913.94 of the Revised Code to enact the Ohio Computer Crimes Act.
Title
Enact the Ohio Computer Crimes Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2021-11-23 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-17 | House | Passed |
2021-11-10 | House | Reported: Criminal Justice |
2021-02-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 09 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 572 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 09 | 88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 37 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 09 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 86 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 13 | 87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 13 | 88 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 13 | 89 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 13 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 13 | 91 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 13 | 92 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 13 | 93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 13 | 94 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 19 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 21 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 27 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 33 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 12 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 21 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 50 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 51 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 03 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 01 | 511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |