OH HB207 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - Effective 8/31/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - Effective 8/31/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4123.35, 4123.93, 4123.931, and 4125.07 and to enact section 4123.932 of the Revised Code to eliminate the minimum number of employees required for a private sector employer or a board of county commissioners with respect to the construction of a sports facility to obtain self-insuring status under the Workers' Compensation Law, to allow a state fund employer to have a workers' compensation claim that is likely to be subrogated by a third party paid from the surplus fund account in the state insurance fund rather than charged to the employer's experience and to require a self- insuring employer resuming paying premiums to the State Insurance Fund or a self-insuring professional employer organization after a lease termination to submit certain records to the Administrator of Workers' Compensation.
Title
Revises payment of subrogated workers' compensation claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | Effective 8/31/16 | |
2016-05-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-01 | House | Passed |
2015-10-19 | House | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2015-05-19 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2015-05-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 23 | 291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 93 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 23 | 932 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 25 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |