OH HB290 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2305.113, 2901.12, 3313.75, 3313.76, 3313.77, 3313.78, 3721.02, and 5165.67 and to enact sections 1901.028, 1907.04, 2301.04, 2501.20, and 3313.791 of the Revised Code regarding the use of school district premises by members of the public and immunity from civil liability for a school district and schools when permitting members of the public to use school premises, regarding the use of results of an inspection of a nursing home or the results of a Medicare or Medicaid survey of a nursing facility in an advertisement, regarding the continued orderly operation of the courts in case of a disaster, civil disorder, or other extraordinary circumstance, and regarding the limitation of claims arising out of skilled nursing care or personal care services provided in a home.
Title
Regarding the use of school district premises by members of the public and immunity from civil liability for a school district and schools when permitting members of the public to use school premises, regarding the use of results of an inspection of a nursing home or the results of a Medicare or Medicaid survey of a nursing facility in an advertisement, regarding the continued orderly operation of the courts in case of a disaster, civil disorder, or other extraordinary circumstance, and regarding the limitation of claims arising out of skilled nursing care or personal care services provided in a home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-11 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-05-15 | To Civil Justice | |
2014-05-15 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-05-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-03-12 | Committee Report | |
2013-10-10 | To Education | |
2013-10-10 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
19 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 01 | 028 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 07 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 01 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 05 | 113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
25 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 01 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 01 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 78 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 791 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 21 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 65 | 67 | Amended Code | Citation Text |