OH HB312 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 3301.85 of the Revised Code to establish the Regional Partnerships Program and to make an appropriation.
Title
Establish Regional Partnerships Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-09 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference |
2024-01-03 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2023-12-13 | House | Reported - Amended: Primary and Secondary Education |
2023-10-31 | House | Referred to committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2023-10-30 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Education
Education : Early Childhood Education
Education : Higher Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
Finance and Appropriations
House Finance Committee
House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
House Rules and Reference Committee
Education : Early Childhood Education
Education : Higher Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
Finance and Appropriations
House Finance Committee
House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
House Rules and Reference Committee