OH HB32 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 4733.011 of the Revised Code to exempt certain plans and measurements relating to household or small flow on-site sewage treatment systems from the Professional Engineers and Surveyors Law, and to authorize the use of the enforcement provisions of the Household and Small Flow On-site Sewage Treatment Systems Law to enforce existing rules governing household sewage disposal systems until those rules are superseded by rules that are required to be adopted under that Law.
Title
To exempt certain plans and measurements relating to household or small flow on-site sewage treatment systems from the Professional Engineers and Surveyors Law, and to authorize the use of the enforcement provisions of the Household and Small Flow On-site Sewage Treatment Systems Law to enforce existing rules governing household sewage disposal systems until those rules are superseded by rules that are required to be adopted under that Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-08 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Effective Date | |
2012-02-21 | Governor' Action | |
2012-02-08 | Concurrence | |
2012-02-01 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-01-26 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-06-14 | To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources | |
2011-06-14 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-05-17 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-01-19 | To Health & Aging | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
47 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 33 | 011 | New Code | See Bill Text |