OH HB352 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-15 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-15 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 2131.03, 2131.031, 2131.032, 2131.033, and 2131.034 of the Revised Code to generally prohibit a person's disability from being used to deny or limit custody, parenting time, visitation, adoption, or service as a guardian or foster caregiver, regarding a minor.
Title
Prohibit disability from being used to deny, limit parenting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-08 | House | Passed |
2021-11-17 | House | Reported - Amended: Civil Justice |
2021-06-22 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2021-06-17 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Health and Human Services : Child Care
Juvenile and Family Law : Adoption
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Custody and Support
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Welfare
Juvenile and Family Law : Foster Care
Health and Human Services : Child Care
Juvenile and Family Law : Adoption
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Custody and Support
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Welfare
Juvenile and Family Law : Foster Care
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 31 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 31 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 31 | 032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 31 | 033 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 31 | 034 | New Code | See Bill Text |