OH HB380 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Referred to committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Referred to committee: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 5533.532, 5534.183, 5534.423, 5534.486, 5534.497, 5534.499, 5534.614, 5534.616, 5534.653, 5534.655, 5534.656, 5534.659, 5534.661, 5534.663, 5534.664, 5534.667, 5534.669, 5534.671, 5534.874, 5534.875, 5534.876, 5534.914, 5534.921, 5534.924, 5534.926, 5534.941, 5534.961, 5534.963, 5534.964, 5534.966, and 5534.967 of the Revised Code to make multiple highway and bridge designations.
Title
Designate Tuscarawas Valley Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Senate | Referred to committee: Transportation |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed |
2024-05-08 | House | Reported - Substitute: Transportation |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to committee: Transportation |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
House Transportation Committee
Senate Transportation Committee
Special Designations
Special Designations : Memorial Highways and Bridges
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Senate Transportation Committee
Special Designations
Special Designations : Memorial Highways and Bridges
Transportation : Highways, Roads, and Bridges
Transportation : Motor Vehicles
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 33 | 532 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 183 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 423 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 486 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 497 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 499 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 614 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 616 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 653 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 655 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 656 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 659 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 661 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 663 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 664 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 667 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 669 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 671 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 874 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 875 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 876 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 914 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 921 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 924 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 926 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 941 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 961 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 963 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 964 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 966 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 967 | New Code | See Bill Text |