OH HB397 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 3701.147 of the Revised Code to increase education, awareness, and understanding of cognitive impairment, Alzheimer's disease, and other types of dementia.
Title
Increase awareness of cognitive impairment, dementia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed |
2024-06-20 | House | Reported: Public Health Policy |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to committee: Public Health Policy |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Aging
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Public Health Policy Committee
Health and Human Services : Aging
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Health and Human Services : Public Health
House Public Health Policy Committee