OH HB503 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Referred to committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Referred to committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 901.43, 942.01, 942.02, 943.23, 943.26, 1531.01, 1533.01, 1533.731, 1533.99, and 4745.01; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 942.13 (942.05); to enact new sections 942.03 and 942.04 and sections 1533.75 and 1533.751; and to repeal sections 942.03, 942.04, 942.05, 942.06, 942.07, 942.10, 942.11, 942.12, and 942.99 of the Revised Code to prohibit certain activities regarding garbage-fed swine, feral swine, and wild boar.
Title
Prohibit activities re: garbage-fed swine, feral swine, wild boar
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Senate | Referred to committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-06-12 | House | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed |
2024-04-30 | House | Referred to committee: Agriculture |
2024-04-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture : Animals
Environment and Natural Resources
House Agriculture Committee
Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Agriculture : Animals
Environment and Natural Resources
House Agriculture Committee
Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 31 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 33 | 731 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 33 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 45 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 01 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 03 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 04 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 05 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 06 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 07 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 42 | 99 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 43 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 43 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |