OH HB51 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-16)
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Effective 2/17/22 - Provisions addressing valuation adjustments effective May 19, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-16)
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Effective 2/17/22 - Provisions addressing valuation adjustments effective May 19, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 319.38 and 5701.11 of the Revised Code to amend the law governing valuation adjustments for destroyed or injured property, to expressly incorporate changes in the Internal Revenue Code since March 31, 2021, into Ohio law, to provide temporary authority, expiring July 1, 2022, for members of a public body to meet by means of teleconference or video conference, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Regards valuation adjustments for destroyed / injured property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Effective 2/17/22 - Provisions addressing valuation adjustments effective May 19, 2022 | |
2022-02-09 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-03-03 | House | Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported: Ways and Means |
2021-02-04 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 19 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 01 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |