OH HB599 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.037 of the Revised Code to designate the walleye as the official fish of the state.
Title
Designate the walleye as the official fish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed |
2024-06-25 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2024-05-21 | House | Referred to committee: State and Local Government |
2024-05-15 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Environment and Natural Resources
House State and Local Government Committee
Special Designations : State Symbols
House State and Local Government Committee
Special Designations : State Symbols