OH HB71 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Effective 3/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Effective 3/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 2305.52 of the Revised Code to prohibit certain indemnity agreements in motor vehicle carrier transportation contracts.
Title
Prohibit indemnity provision - motor vehicle transport contract
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Effective 3/23/16 | |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Reported: Civil Justice |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported: Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | To committee: Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
23 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 05 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |