OH SB137 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3501.01 and 5747.502 and to enact sections 3505.011, 3513.141, 5747.504, and 5747.505 of the Revised Code to generally prohibit the use of ranked choice voting and to withhold Local Government Fund distributions from a municipality or chartered county that uses ranked choice voting.
Title
Generally prohibit use of ranked choice voting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: General Government |
2023-07-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 05 | 011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 13 | 141 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 505 | New Code | See Bill Text |