OH SB172 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 718.03, 718.05, 5709.17, and 5739.02 of the Revised Code to exempt from sales and use taxes the sale or use of investment metal bullion and coins, to expand eligibility for the fraternal organization property tax exemption to property of an organization operating under a state governing body that has been operating in Ohio for at least eight-five years, to extend the deadline for payments of quarterly municipal income tax withholding taxes, and to modify the rules for when municipal income tax withholding payments are considered to have been made.
Title
Exempts investment bullion and coins from sales tax
Sponsors
Rep. Kris Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Effective 9/14/16 | |
2016-05-25 | House | Informally passed |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed |
2016-01-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2015-12-14 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Reported: Ways and Means |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 09 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 39 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 18 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 18 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |