OH SB232 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 717.25, 1710.01, 1710.02, 1710.06, 1710.07, 4928.01, 4928.64, 5709.53, 5713.30, 5713.34, 5727.01, 5727.02, 5727.06, 5727.11, 5727.111, 5727.15, 5727.30, and 5739.02 and to enact sections 1710.061, 4935.10, and 5727.75 of the Revised Code to exempt qualifying energy facilities from property taxation upon county approval, to require payments in lieu of taxes on the basis of each megawatt of production capacity of such facilities, to expand special improvement district energy improvement projects and the municipal solar energy revolving loan program law to include alternative energy, to address the treatment of energy efficiency savings and reductions in demand regarding certain energy projects, to prohibit the use of the exemption to determine the cost of compliance for the state's alternative energy portfolio standard, to clarify the sales and use tax treatment of related energy conversion equipment purchases, to specify that operators of such facilities are subject to the commercial activity tax, to require the Public Utilities Commission to study reactive power in the state, and to declare an emergency.
Title
To exempt qualifying energy facilities from property taxation upon county approval, to require payments in lieu of taxes on the basis of each megawatt of production capacity of such facilities, to expand special improvement district energy improvement projects and the municipal solar energy revolving loan program law to include alternative energy, to address the treatment of energy efficiency savings and reductions in demand regarding certain energy projects, to prohibit the use of the exemption to determine the cost of compliance for the state's alternative energy portfolio standard, to clarify the sales and use tax treatment of related energy conversion equipment purchases, to specify that operators of such facilities are subject to the commercial activity tax, to require the Public Utilities Commission to study reactive power in the state, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2010-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2010-06-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2010-05-18 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2010-05-13 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-02-24 | To Energy & Public Utilities | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced to House | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2010-06-03 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-05-19 | To Ways & Means | |
2010-05-19 | Introduced to Senate |