OH SB277 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-29 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-05-29 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Summary
To enact sections 1901.185 and 3767.50 of the Revised Code to create a new cause of action in foreclosure in the environmental division of a municipal court to abate blighted parcels.
Title
Environmental/Housing Division-new foreclosure action-abate nuisances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-05-28 | Committee Report | |
2008-01-22 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2008-01-22 | Introduced to House | |
2008-06-03 | To Civil & Commercial Law | |
2008-06-03 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_277 |