OH SB29 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 149.43 and 3319.31 and to enact sections 3319.325, 3319.326, and 3319.327 of the Revised Code regarding educational records and student data privacy.
Title
Regards education records and student data privacy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed |
2024-06-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education |
2023-11-28 | House | Referred to committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2023-11-16 | House | Introduced |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Passed |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Education |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to committee: Education |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Senate Education Committee
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Senate Education Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 49 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 325 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | 326 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | 327 | New Code | See Bill Text |