OH SB40 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-24 - Effective Certain sections effective January 1, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on October 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-24 - Effective Certain sections effective January 1, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1751.85, 1753.09, 3901.21, 3923.86, 3963.01, 3963.02, 3963.03, and 4715.30 and to enact sections 4715.271 and 4715.272 of the Revised Code to enter into the Dentist and Dental Hygienist Compact and to address limitations imposed by health insurers on dental care services.
Title
Enter the Dentist and Dental Hygienist Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-24 | Effective Certain sections effective January 1, 2025 | |
2024-07-15 | Sent To The Governor | |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed |
2024-05-15 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health Provider Services |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to committee: Health Provider Services |
2023-06-13 | House | Introduced |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to committee: Health |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services : Health Care
House Health Provider Services Committee
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Health Committee
House Health Provider Services Committee
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Health Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 51 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 53 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 86 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 63 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 63 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 63 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 271 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 272 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |