OK HB1068 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1068
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement; Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; definition; eligibility; death benefits; employee contribution; reference; effective date.
Title
Retirement; Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; definition; eligibility; death benefits; employee contribution; reference; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh West [R] | Sen. Darrell Weaver [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] |
Rep. Neil Hays [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Approved by Governor 05/08/2024 |
2024-05-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-05-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-05-02 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-02 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 0 |
2024-05-02 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2024-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Burns |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin, Hays |
2024-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative West (Josh) |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1068 (Carry Over) 2023-02-20 - Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act