OK HB1072 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1072
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; investigation; court hearing; report; effective date.
Title
Children; investigation; court hearing; report; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2023 |
2023-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-14 | House | General Order |
2023-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Talley |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1072 (Carry Over) 2023-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2023