OK HB1151 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1151
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; creating the Procurement Protection Act of 2024; intent; restrictions; disclosure; penalties; effective date.
Title
State government; creating the Procurement Protection Act of 2024; intent; restrictions; disclosure; penalties; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 3 |
2024-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1151 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules