OK HB2312 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2312
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; competency; youthful offender; Office of Juvenile Affairs; records; services; effective date.
Title
Children; competency; youthful offender; Office of Juvenile Affairs; records; services; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-27 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-03-08 | Senate | coauthored by Virgin |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2312 (Carry Over) 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021