OK HB2996 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement; Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System; terms; references; emergency.
Title
Retirement; Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System; terms; references; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Lepak |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |